Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company v Ramirez et al

Plaintiff: Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Ace Glass Repair Inc, General Casualty Insurance Company Inc, Tim W Smith Properties LLC, Kenneth D Ramirez and Robin S Ramirez
Case Number: 3:2011cv00057
Filed: March 22, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss & dismissing the case. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/27/2012. (jct)
April 20, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 MOTION for Default Judgment against Robin S Ramirez and Kenneth Ramrirez filed by Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/20/12. (vjt)
April 3, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER referring 42 Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment against Robin S Ramirez & Kenneth Ramrirez to the Clerk of the Court for consideration of entry of a Clerk's default. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/3/2012. (jct)
March 21, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 36 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/21/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company v Ramirez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Glass Repair Inc
Represented By: Wendell L. Hoskins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Casualty Insurance Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim W Smith Properties LLC
Represented By: Wendell L. Hoskins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth D Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin S Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: James A. Hamilton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?