LNV Corporation v. Becton

Plaintiff: LNV Corporation
Defendant: Paul Becton
Case Number: 3:2011cv00062
Filed: March 31, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Joint MOTION to Dismiss. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/24/2012. (jct)
March 29, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Before a final judgment is entered, Plaintiff is directed to submit an exact accounting of the amount of money it is entitled to, including pre-judgment interest, the application of the foreclosure & settlement proceeds, & attorneys' fees. Plaintiff should do so w/i 14 days of the entry of this Order. Defendant may respond w/i 7 days. The amount of the Judgment will be determined based on these pleadings. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/29/2012. (jct)
January 26, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses ; denying 12 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery. If the Defendants intend to raise any other affirmative defenses, they must notify the Court before doing so. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/26/2012. (jct)
January 19, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order. (Discovery deadline is now 5:00 p.m. on 2/8/2012; Dispositive Motions due by 5:00 p.m. on 2/16/2012). Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/19/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LNV Corporation v. Becton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LNV Corporation
Represented By: Grant E. Fortson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Becton
Represented By: Ralph W. Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?