Rentrak Corporation v. Flickers LP et al

Plaintiff: Rentrak Corporation
Defendant: Flickers LP, Flickers II LP, Flickers III LP, Flickers V LLC, KJS West Memphis LLC, BBV Holdings LLC, BBV-GP Inc, New England Video Ltd, New York Video Ltd and BBV-GP II Inc
Case Number: 3:2011cv00067
Filed: April 6, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is awarded $15,853.36 in attorneys' fees from Defendants Flickers LP; Flickers II LP; Flickers III LP; Flickers V LLC; KJS West Memphis LLC; BBV Holdings LLC; BBV-GP Inc; BBV-GP II Inc; New York Videos Ltd; & New England Video Ltd. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/3/2011. (jct)
July 18, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Rentrak Corporation against BBV-GP Inc, Flickers LP in the amount of $23,147.39; in favor of Rentrak Corporation against BBV-GP Inc, Flickers II LP in the amount of $33,111.01; in favor of Rentrak Corporation ag ainst BBV-GP Inc, Flickers III LP in the amount of $50,265.00; in favor of Rentrak Corporation against BBV Holdings LLC, Flickers V LLC in the amount of $6,943.92; in favor of Rentrak Corporation against BBV Holdings LLC, KJS West Memphis L LC in the amount of $4,201.92; in favor of Rentrak Corporation against BBV-GP II Inc, New York Video Ltd in the amount of $15,096.34; in favor of Rentrak Corporation against BBV-GP II Inc, New England Video Ltd in the amount of $26,408 .38; in favor of Rentrak Corporation against BBV Holdings LLC, BBV-GP Inc, Flickers II LP, Flickers III LP, Flickers LP, Flickers V LLC, KJS West Memphis LLC in the amount of $42,736.65 for presenting checks to Plaintiff that were returned for i nsufficient funds; in favor of Rentrak Corporation against BBV-GP II Inc, New England Video Ltd, New York Video Ltd in the amount of $70,011.48 for presenting checks to Plaintiff that were returned for insufficient funds. Plaintiff is entitled to post-judgment interest at 0.19% on the above amounts under 28 U.S.C. Section 1961. The Court grants in part & denies in part, as stated herein, 7 MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants filed by Rentrak Corporation. Plaintiff's request for pre-judgment interest is denied. Plaintiff's request for attorneys' fees & costs is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/18/2011. (jct)
June 7, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 5 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. When Plaintiff refiles its motion, it is directed to explain, in plenary detail, how it arrived at the amounts it is requesting in damages. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/7/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rentrak Corporation v. Flickers LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rentrak Corporation
Represented By: Lindsey C. Pesek
Represented By: Michael Norris Shannon
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Treece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flickers LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flickers II LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flickers III LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flickers V LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KJS West Memphis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBV Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBV-GP Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New England Video Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Video Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBV-GP II Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?