Gray v. BNSF Railway Company et al

Plaintiff: Vanessa Gray
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company, Dewayne A Graves, Randy E Buckner, Hosie Gladney and Kim Williams
Case Number: 3:2011cv00091
Filed: May 23, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to settlement. Plaintiff's 2 Complaint, 5 Amended Complaint, and all claims in this action are hereby dismissed with prejudice with each party bearing its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 03/19/2013. (jak)
October 5, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Defendant BNSF's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Ms. Gray's negligence claims relating to the adequacy of the warning devices at the crossing and excessive train speed are preempted by federal law, those claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/5/2012. (jak)
March 13, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 MOTION to Continue the 5/7/2012 trial date filed by BNSF Railway Company. A new trial date will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/13/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Gray
Represented By: Michael Jered Medlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Barry Deacon
Represented By: Alfred F. Angulo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewayne A Graves
Represented By: Alfred F. Angulo, Jr.
Represented By: Barry Deacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy E Buckner
Represented By: Alfred F. Angulo, Jr.
Represented By: Barry Deacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hosie Gladney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?