Nichols et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al

Plaintiff: Brian Nichols and Wanda Nichols
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company and Christopher A Avery
Case Number: 3:2011cv00101
Filed: June 3, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting request that the court retain jurisdiction for an additional fifteen days. The Courts jurisdiction is hereby extended up to, and including, September 16, 2012.. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 08/23/2012. (jak)
August 6, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL pursuant to settlement. Case dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 08/06/2012. (jak)
July 19, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 12 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by BNSF Railway Company. The Nichols' failure to warn claim is preempted by federal law and, therefore, is dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/19/2012. (jct)
July 3, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 MOTION to Dismiss Christopher A. Avery. Plaintiffs' complaint against Christopher A. Avery is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/3/2012. (jct)
February 23, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 MOTION to Continue filed by BNSF Railway Company. The 4/30/12 trial date is removed from the Court's docket. A new trial date & scheduling deadlines will be set by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/23/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Nichols
Represented By: Bill E. Bracey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Nichols
Represented By: Bill E. Bracey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Alfred F. Angulo, Jr.
Represented By: Barry Deacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?