Bowen v. Arnold et al

Plaintiff: Joseph N Bowen
Defendant: Larry Mills, Becky Hitt, Andy Allison, Susan Cox and Paulett Arnold
Case Number: 3:2011cv00104
Filed: June 6, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Hot Spring
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing Bowen's complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/24/2012. (jct)
January 23, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 16 Defendants' MOTION to Compel, advising Plaintiff to file a response w/i 10 days of the date of this Order. Failure to respond may result in the dismissal without prejudice of Plaintiff's Complaint for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/23/2012. (jct)
July 13, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 5 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney. Defendants Paulett Arnold and Larry Mills are dismissed from Bowen's Complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/13/2011. (jct)
July 1, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER setting following deadlines: (Discovery due by 12/30/2011, Motions due by 1/30/2012). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/1/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowen v. Arnold et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Hitt
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Allison
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Cox
Represented By: C. Burt Newell
Represented By: Nicholas Rudolph Windle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paulett Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph N Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?