Estes v. Burnside et al

Plaintiff: Tonia Estes
Defendant: John Does, David Burnside, Walnut Ridge Arkansas, City of, Dan Ellis, Lawrence County, Arkansas and Lawrence County Jail
Case Number: 3:2011cv00109
Filed: June 13, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Joint Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction to: enforce the terms of the settlement agreement; vacate this order; and reopen this action upon good cause shown that the settlement has not been completed and further litigation is necessary. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 09/27/2012. (jak)
July 26, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Joint MOTION to Extend Discovery & Dispositive Motion Deadlines. (Discovery due by 9/25/2012; Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2012). Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/26/2012. (jct)
September 13, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion for More Definite Statement. Defense counsel should forthwith email or fax Plaintiff's counsel advising in exact detail why defense counsel believes service has been insufficient. A copy of this email or fax should be sent to the Clerk of the Court & to me, attention Ms. Genoveva Gilbert. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/13/2011. (jct)
August 8, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, pursuant to 2 Answer to Complaint, the Clerk is directed to correctly identify Defendant Dan Ellison. Signed at the Direction of the Court by Mary A. Johnson on 8/8/2011. (jct)
August 2, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. The response deadline for David Burnside & Walnut Ridge Arkansas, City of is extended to 5:00 p.m. on 8/19/2011. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/2/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estes v. Burnside et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Burnside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walnut Ridge Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence County, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonia Estes
Represented By: Stewart K. Lambert
Represented By: Raymond T. Starken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?