Nassar et al v. Jackson et al

Plaintiff: Ray Nassar and Gena Smith
Defendant: Earnestine Jackson, Jimmy Wilkins, Hughes School District, Rudolph Robinson, Demarcus Burks, Leitha Cupples, Irene Combs, Jeff Spaletta and W E Duckworth
Case Number: 3:2011cv00133
Filed: July 11, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2015 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 199 Motion to Withdraw. The motion to enforce the supersedeas bond, 197 , is withdrawn. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/14/2015. (jak)
June 3, 2015 191 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 190 Order, noting a clerical error in the first amended judgment as to Plaintiff Ray Nassar, 189 , it is hereby ordered and adjudged that Plaintiff Ray Nassar have and recover the accepted remitted amount of $245,63 9.38 in compensatory damages from defendants Hughes School District and Earnestine Jackson, jointly and severally, and $2,500 in compensatory damages and $10,000 in punitive damages against defendant Earnestine Jackson, individually. Post- judgment interest shall continue to accrue at the rate of.14% per annum. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/3/2015. (jak)
May 29, 2015 189 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT as to PLAINTIFF RAY NASSAR. Consistent with the 188 Order of Remittitur, it is hereby ordered and adjudged that Plaintiff Ray Nassar have and recover the accepted remitted amount of $245,639.38 in compensatory damages from d efendants Hughes School District and Earnestine Jackson, jointly and severally; $2,500 in compensatory damages and $10,000 in punitive damages against defendant Earnestine Jackson, individually; and $16,000 in compensatory damages and $4,000 in punitive damages against Defendant Jimmy Wilkins, individually. Post-judgment interest shall continue to accrue at the rate of.14% per annum. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/29/2015. (jak)
May 11, 2015 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 183 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court extends to Nassar a third and final offer of remittitur in the amount of $245,639.38. Should Nassar refuse this offer, the Court will schedule a second trial, limited to the issue of th e value of Nassar's salary and benefits during the term of his three-year contract. Nassar has up to and including five days from the entry date of this Order to file notice stating whether he accepts this Court's officer of remittitur. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/11/2015. (jak)
April 8, 2015 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 179 Motion for Order; denying as moot 181 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/8/2015. (jak)
March 27, 2015 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Nassar is once again offered reduced damages in the amount of $245,639.38. Should Nassar refuse this offer, the Court will schedule a second trial, limited to the issue of the value of Nassar's salary and benefits during the term of his three-year contract. Nassar has up to and including thirty days from the entry date of this Order to file notice stating whether he accepts the Court's offer of remittitur. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/27/2015. (jak)
March 25, 2015 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: In accordance with the Eighth Circuit's mandate dated March 24, 2015, Nassar is offered reduced damages in the amount of $245,639.38. Should Nassar refuse this offer, the Court will schedule a second trial. Nassar has up to and including fourteen days from the entry date of this Order to file notice stating whether he accepts the Court's offer of remittitur. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/25/2015. (jak)
April 22, 2013 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 144 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiffs are hereby awarded costs in the amount of $1,262.03. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 04/22/2013. (jak)
March 28, 2013 143 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to the jury verdicts rendered in this case on January 22, 2013, and 142 Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff Gina Smith have and recover $86,541 in compensatory damages from defendant Hughes School Distric t and $2,500 in compensatory damages and $5,000 in punitive damages from defendant Earnestine Jackson--plus post-judgment interest to accrue at the rate of.14% per annum and Plaintiff Ray Nassar have and recover $360,001 in com pensatory damages from defendants Hughes School District and Earnestine Jackson, jointly and severally; and $2,500 in compensatory damages and $10,000 in punitive damages against defendant Earnestine Jackson, individually plus post- judgment interest to accrue at the rate of.14% per annum. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 03/28/2013. (jak)
February 14, 2013 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 121 Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of a writ of execution. Plaintiffs may obtain a writs of execution by applying directly to the Clerk of the Court. Plaintiffs must draft a writ of execution and present it to the Clerk of the Court for the Clerks review and endorsement. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/14/2013. (jak)
February 8, 2013 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 112 and 113 Defendants' Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/8/2013. (jak)
February 5, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 111 Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Writs as premature. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/5/2013. (jak)
January 24, 2013 109 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT that (1) Gena Smith have and recover $86,541 in compensatory damages from defendant Hughes School District and $2,500 in compensatory damages and $5,000 in punitive damages from defendant Earnestine Jackson--pl us post-judgment interest to accrue at the rate of.14% per annum; and (2) Plaintiff Ray Nassar have and recover $360,001 in compensatory damages from defendants Hughes School District and Earnestine Jackson, jointly and severally; $2, 500 in compensatory damages and $10,000 in punitive damages against defendant Earnestine Jackson, individually; and $16,000 in compensatory damages and $4,000 in punitive damages against Defendant Jimmy Wilkins - plus post-judgment interest to accrue at the rate of.14% annum. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/24/2013. (jak)
January 14, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to General Order 54, attorney James F. Valley is permitted to bring his electronic device(s) into the Jonesboro Courthouse for the duration of the jury trial in this case. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/14/2013. (jak)
January 8, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER instructing the parties that all requests for relief must be made by written motion and filed with the Clerk. The Court will not respond to email messages, letters and faxes. If parties wish to be heard on a matter before the Court, they must do so in the form of a motion or other appropriate filing. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/8/2013. (jak)
November 5, 2012 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 73 Defendants' Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/5/2012. (jak)
September 10, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 58 Plaintiff Smith's Motion for Summary Judgment and Reconsideration. The motion is granted to the extent that the Court finds, as a matter o f law, that Defendants terminated Smith's employment contract without providing her procedural due process. The amount of any damages resulting from that constitutional deprivation remains an issue for trial. Smith's motion for summary judgment on her breach of contract claim is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 09/10/2012. (jak)
September 7, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 50 Motion in Limine. Plaintiffs should resubmit their motion closer to trial. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 09/07/2012. (jak)
July 10, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rescheduling (Jury Trial for week of 1/14/2013 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge Susan Webber Wright). All deadlines for discovery & motions have expired; other deadlines remain consistent with the new trial setting. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/10/2012. (jct)
June 22, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 58 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment and for reconsideration filed by Gena Smith, the Court will reconsider Smith's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment based on the supplemental evidence she has provided. Defendants have up to & including 10 days from entry of this Order in which to file a supplemental response in opposition to Smith's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Smith's Motion for Reconsideration 58 remains pending. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/22/2012. (jct)
June 18, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Ray Nassar's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that the Court finds, as a matter of law, that Defendants terminated Nassar's employment contract witho ut providing him procedural due process. Nassar's motion on his breach of contract claim is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 36 Plaintiff Gena Smith's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/18/2012. (jct)
June 14, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice 42 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendants are ordered to provide complete responses to Plaintiffs' First, Second, Third & Fourth Sets of Interrogatories & Requests for Production & provide Plaintiffs internet protocol addresses sought under a subpoena duces tecum w/i 10 days from the entry date of this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/14/2012. (jct)
March 13, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 22 & 28 Motions to Amend. Plaintiffs may resubmit a single motion to amend, which complies with the requirements of Local Rule 5.5(e). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 23 Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Counsel is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/13/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nassar et al v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Nassar
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gena Smith
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earnestine Jackson
Represented By: Vandell Bland, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Wilkins
Represented By: Vandell Bland, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hughes School District
Represented By: Vandell Bland, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudolph Robinson
Represented By: Vandell Bland, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demarcus Burks
Represented By: Vandell Bland, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leitha Cupples
Represented By: Vandell Bland, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene Combs
Represented By: Vandell Bland, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Spaletta
Represented By: Vandell Bland, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W E Duckworth
Represented By: Vandell Bland, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?