Young v. West Memphis Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Michael Young
Defendant: Lester Ditto, Robert Paudert, Scott McCall and West Memphis Police Department
Case Number: 3:2011cv00161
Filed: August 12, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss. This case is dismissed with prejudice, and the Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/30/2013. (jak)
December 5, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Defendants' MOTION to Stay Proceedings. The Clerk's Office is directed to administratively terminate the case without prejudice & the parties are directed to file a motion to reopen, if necessary, when the criminal matter has been resolved. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/5/2011. (jct)
October 31, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants must file an answer or other responsive pleading by 5:00 p.m. on 11/18/2011. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/31/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. West Memphis Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester Ditto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Paudert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Memphis Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Young
Represented By: Bridgett Frazier
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?