Poteet v. Arkansas Methodist Hospital Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Marion Joe Poteet
Defendant: Arkansas Methodist Hospital Corporation, Darrell Bonner, John Wilson, Dan Langston and John Does
Case Number: 3:2011cv00189
Filed: September 22, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 55 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Poteet's claims against the remaining Defendants are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to their settlement. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 08/01/2013. (jak)
July 5, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Arkansas Methodist Hospital, & dismissing all claims against the Hospital without prejudice. The Court denies as moot 23 Motion for Summary Judgment & 38 Motion to Dismiss filed by the Hospital. The case will go forward only against Langston, Tedder & the Does. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/5/2012. (jct)
May 17, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 John Wilson's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's EMTALA claim is dismissed with prejudice by agreement. His ACRA & Section 1983 claims are dismissed without prejudice with leave to amend & clarify. By 6/8/2012, Poteet must file an amended complaint pursuant to this Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/17/2012. (jct)
May 4, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Response time. Poteet's response to 23 Motion for Summary Judgment is due 6/29/2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/4/2012. (jct)
February 9, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss his claims against Darrell Bonner M.D. Those claims are dismissed without prejudice as to Bonner. The Clerk is directed to terminate Bonner as a party. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/9/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poteet v. Arkansas Methodist Hospital Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Joe Poteet
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Methodist Hospital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?