Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. AT&T

Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: AT&T
Case Number: 3:2011cv00196
Filed: September 29, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT DECREE Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 03/05/2013. (jak)
August 21, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Clayborne S. Stone filed by Southwestern Bell Telephone Company. Mr. Stone is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 08/21/2012. (jak)
August 14, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information in this action. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 08/14/2012. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. AT&T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Joseph M. Crout
Represented By: Deidre Smith
Represented By: Faye A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?