Evans v. Crittenden Regional Hospital et al

Plaintiff: Marissa Evans
Defendant: Crittenden Regional Hospital, Johnnie Holmes and Terry Chambers
Case Number: 3:2011cv00229
Filed: August 23, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to the jury verdict on December 11, 2012, in favor of defendants Crittenden Regional Hospital, Johnnie Holmes, Terry Chambers. Plaintiff Marissa Evans's claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/12/2012. (jak)
December 7, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating 28 Order on Motion in Limine. Further, Defendants' 24 MOTION in Limine is denied without prejudice. Although plaintiff has clearly stated that she did not rely on what appears to be a typographical error contained in def endants' leave policy, this is an issue best left for cross examination and it would be improper to preclude plaintiff from addressing it at trial. Defendants may, however, object to this evidence at trial and preserve its record for appeal. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/7/2012. (jak)
May 29, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information in this cause of action. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/29/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Crittenden Regional Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crittenden Regional Hospital
Represented By: Gerald A. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnnie Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marissa Evans
Represented By: Alvin Leonard Simes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?