Dillard v. Underwood et al

Plaintiff: James Wesley Dillard
Defendant: T J Underwood, Patrick Martin and Ron Harvey
Case Number: 3:2011cv00293
Filed: December 19, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER cancelling the November 1, 2012 Hearing and Transportation Order as set forth in 50 Order. The Clerk shall forward a copy of this Order to ADC Central Transportation/Medical Services, 6814 Princeton Pike, Pine Bluff, AR 71602. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/29/2012. (jak)
May 1, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/1/2012. (jct)
April 11, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice as moot 27 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/11/2012. (jct)
January 17, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 3 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney in their entirety. IT IS THEREFORE, ORDERED that Defendant Jack Landsdown is DISMISSED from Plaintiff's Complaint for failure to state a claim. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/17/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dillard v. Underwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wesley Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T J Underwood
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Martin
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Harvey
Represented By: Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?