Bates v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Dennis Keith Bates
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2012cv00002
Filed: January 4, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 19 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff's counsel is entitled to an award of $17,460.00 for attorney's fees for work at the District Court level under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b). Plaintiff's attorney shall refund to Plaintiff the earlier EAJA award of attorney's fees in the amount of $4,005.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/22/2014. (jak)
April 7, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff's counsel to file, within fourteen days of the entry of this Order, a Response indicating whether he requested an award of attorney's fees from the Commissioner for his administrative-level work pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(a); and if so, whether the Commissioner granted his § 406(a) attorney's fee request, and in what amount. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/7/2014. (jak)
April 2, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees pursuant to the EAJA. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/02/2013. (jak)
November 26, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 12 Memorandum Order, It is considered ordered and adjudged that judgment be entered for the Plaintiff, reversing the decision of the Commissioner, and remanding this case to the Commissioner for further proceedings pursuant to sentence four. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/26/12. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Keith Bates
Represented By: David Jerome Throesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?