McHone et al v. Diamond S Express Inc et al

Plaintiff: Christie McHone and Orande Anderson
Defendant: Diamond S Express Inc, M C Mauney, Thomas A Young and John Does
Case Number: 3:2012cv00008
Filed: January 10, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's 60 Counter-Motion is denied. Plaintiff's are directed to file a status report on or before April 18, 2014 advising the Court as to which, if any, claims are remaining in the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/14/2014. (jak)
May 22, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 05/22/2013. (jak)
December 19, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Defendants' MOTION to Continue filed by Diamond S Express Inc. Consistent with the Agreed Order Appointing Rehabilitator and Permanent Injunction entered on December 4, 2012 in the District Court of Travis County, Texas (D-1-GV-12-001713), the February 4, 2013 trial date for the case pending before this Court is postponed, and all scheduling deadlines are extended until such time as the stay and injunction is lifted, or such other time as is ordered by this Cour t. The Defendants are directed to file a status report with the Court thirty days from the date of this Order and every thirty days thereafter and within five days after the stay has been lifted in the Texas bankruptcy proceedings. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/19/2012. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McHone et al v. Diamond S Express Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond S Express Inc
Represented By: Lee L. Piovarcy
Represented By: John Lewis Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M C Mauney
Represented By: Lee L. Piovarcy
Represented By: John Lewis Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A Young
Represented By: Lee L. Piovarcy
Represented By: John Lewis Wardlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christie McHone
Represented By: Donald Leon Parker, II
Represented By: Harry S. Hurst, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orande Anderson
Represented By: Donald Leon Parker, II
Represented By: Harry S. Hurst, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?