Gregory v. Gentry et al

Plaintiff: James C Gregory
Defendant: Cody Gentry, Ross Thompson and Blytheville Arkansas, City of
Case Number: 3:2012cv00013
Filed: January 13, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2012 97 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 96 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is granted and this case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 09/10/2012. (jak)
August 27, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 93 Plaintiff's Motion for Criminal Charges to be Assessed Thru Federal Grand Jury. The Clerk of the Court is directed to not accept any further motions from Plaintiff asking for criminal charges to be assessed through the grand jury. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 08/27/2012. (jak)
August 21, 2012 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 90 Motion for criminal charges to be assessed thru federal grand jury. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 08/21/2012. (jak)
August 15, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 85 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Original Lawsuit; denying 86 Plaintiff's Motion for Criminal Charges to be Assessed Thru Federal Grand Jury. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 08/15/2012. (jak)
July 31, 2012 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 60 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/31/2012. (jct)
July 6, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, having no leanings for or against Plaintiff, the 69 Motion for Recusal is DENIED. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/6/2012. (jct)
June 7, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal of Judge. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/7/2012. (jct)
June 5, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 Plaintiff's Motion to Order Counsel to Ask for Discovery. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/5/2012. (jct)
May 23, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 50 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/23/2012. (jct)
May 14, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 41 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 46 Defendant's Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/14/2012. (jct)
March 28, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting in part and denying in part 29 & 33 Motion to Subpoena and/or Summons. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the Summons & Complaint on Defendants in th is action without costs. Plaintiff asks that numerous non-defendants be served. Because Plaintiff's Complaint makes no mention of these individuals, Plaintiff's Motions are DENIED as to all non-defendants. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/28/2012. (jct)
March 7, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 25 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. A motion for summary judgment in this case is premature, as it appears no Defendant has yet been served. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/7/2012. (jct)
January 23, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Plaintiff's Motion to Recuse Judge. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/23/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. Gentry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blytheville Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?