Brewer et al v. Gately et al

Plaintiff: Michael Jiles, Jeffery Carter, Chris Jackson and Dennis Brewer
Defendant: Wayne Gately, William Johnson and West Memphis Arkansas, City of
Case Number: 3:2012cv00028
Filed: January 31, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 18 Order dismissing the complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/15/2012. (jak)
August 8, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, for good cause shown, Plaintiffs time to serve their complaint is reopened and extended until 31 August 2012. Associating new co-counsel, which attorney Burks said she intended to do, should be explored sooner rather than later. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 08/08/2012. (jak)
July 13, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, due to counsel's lack of response to 6 Order, (Status Conference set for 7/31/2012 at 3:00 PM in Little Rock Courtroom # B-155 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr.). Plaintiff's counsel, Addie Burks, should come prepared as directed. If this showing is not made, the Court will consider a reference to the appropriate committees. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the named Plaintiffs (Brewer, Jiles, Carter & Jackson) & to the interested non-party (Lewis). Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/13/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer et al v. Gately et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jiles
Represented By: Addie M. Burks
Represented By: Javier M. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Carter
Represented By: Javier M. Bailey
Represented By: Addie M. Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Jackson
Represented By: Javier M. Bailey
Represented By: Addie M. Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Brewer
Represented By: Addie M. Burks
Represented By: Javier M. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Gately
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Memphis Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?