White v. Rice Belt Telephone Company Inc

Plaintiff: Glynda White
Defendant: Rice Belt Telephone Company Inc
Thirdparty_defendant: Robert C Pierson
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Rice Belt Telephone Company Inc
Case Number: 3:2012cv00062
Filed: February 29, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Poinsett
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing with prejudice this action in its entirety with the parties to bear their own legal fees and costs. This matter is therefore removed from the Court's trial docket for the week of 5/9/2016. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/19/2016. (ljb)
June 4, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 20 Stipulation of Dismissal. Ms. White's complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to defendant Rice Belt Telephone Co Inc. Rice Belt's third-party complaint against Robert C. Pierson remains pending. The Court directs Rice Belt and Mr. Pierson to file within 10 days of this Order status reports as to the status of the third-party complaint and what remains to be done to move this case toward conclusion. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/4/2015. (jak)
November 13, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to file a supplemental administrative record containing written plan documents by December 2, 2014. Glynda White shall file a supplemental brief on or before January 6, 2015, and Rice Belt Telephone Co., Inc., shall file a supplemental brief on or before January 20, 2015. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/13/2014. (jak)
October 28, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to file within thirty days from the date of this Order a supplemental administrative record containing written plan documents. Ms. White shall file a supplemental brief within 21 days thereafter, and Rice Belt shall file a supplemental brief within 14 days after Ms. White files her supplemental brief. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/28/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Rice Belt Telephone Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glynda White
Represented By: Bill W. Bristow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rice Belt Telephone Company Inc
Represented By: Harry S. Hurst, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Robert C Pierson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Rice Belt Telephone Company Inc
Represented By: Harry S. Hurst, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?