Ware v. Hall et al

Plaintiff: Jonathan A Ware
Defendant: Hall, Davidson, Holiday, John Smith and Jeremy Smith
Case Number: 3:2012cv00084
Filed: March 26, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 56 Order entered on this day, this case is dismissed with prejudice, pursuant to settlement. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/6/2013. (jak)
May 15, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to issue and the U.S. Marshal to serve, trial subpoenas for Renee Canizales-Ware and Taylor Lattimore at addresses provided in 34 Witness List filed by Jonathan A Ware. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 05/15/2013. (kcs)
May 2, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the ADC to transport the Plaintiff to the 6/4/2013 Evidentiary Hearing in Little Rock, Arkansas before Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 05/02/2013. (kcs)
January 9, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the ADC to transport the Plaintiff to the Evidentiary Hearing/Trial scheduled for 1/23/2013 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/09/2013. (kcs)
June 26, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to REFRAIN FROM DOCKETING any future written discovery from Plaintiff. Plaintiff's 24 Motion for Discovery, which has been construed as a Motion for a Subpoena Duces Tecum, is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to pre pare a subpoena duces tecum to the Warden of the East AR Regional Unit for the production, to the Court, of: (a) any Incident Reports prepared about the 9/24/11 use of force against Plaintiff at the Craighead County Detention Center; & (b) any photographs taken. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the subpoena duces tecum on the Warden of the East AR Regional Unit. Plaintiff's 23 Motion for Bench Trial is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 6/26/2012. (jct)
April 25, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 5 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of U.S. Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray as this Court's findings. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 7 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Pursuant to the screening function ma ndated by 28 U.S.C. Section 1915A, Plaintiff's claims against Defendants, in their official capacities, are DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff may PROCEED with his excessive fo rce claims against Defendants in their individual capacities only. The Clerk is directed to prepare summons for Defendants Hall, Davidson, John Smith, Jeremy Smith & Holiday. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve said Defendants without prepayment of fees & costs or security therefor. The Court CERTIFIES, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/25/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ware v. Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan A Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?