Old St Paul Missionary Baptist Church v. Templebloc Inc et al

Plaintiff: Old St Paul Missionary Baptist Church
Defendant: Templebloc Inc, Kenneth Blockett and State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv00102
Filed: April 23, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 88 Order that was entered this day, this case is dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/5/2014. (ks)
July 23, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion for Summary Judgment. It is granted as to Old St. Paul's claims against State Farm for estoppel and against Templebloc and Blockett for violations of Ark. Code Ann. § 23-65-101(f). It is denied as to the breach of contract claim. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/23/2013. (jak)
December 7, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 13 Defendant State Farm's Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, Plaintiff St. Paul is instructed to file its amended complaint within thirty days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/7/2012. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Old St Paul Missionary Baptist Church v. Templebloc Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old St Paul Missionary Baptist Church
Represented By: Lawrence W. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Templebloc Inc
Represented By: James W. Tilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Blockett
Represented By: James W. Tilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: John E. Moore
Represented By: Beverly A. Rowlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?