Chandler et al v. Jacobs Engineering Group Inc et al

Plaintiff: Ted Chandler and Martha Chandler
Defendant: Jacobs Engineering Group Inc, Paul David Penn, Mark Asher, Robert Wilcox, Jr and APAC-Tennessee Inc
Case Number: 3:2012cv00104
Filed: April 24, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2014 150 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER-ORDER regarding presumptive time limits for witnesses to be called at the trial on June 9, 2014. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/2/2014. (jak)
May 29, 2014 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 119 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 121 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/29/2014. (jak)
May 28, 2014 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 122 Motion in Limine; granting 123 Motion in Limine; denying 124 Motion in Limine; denying 125 Motion in Limine with respect to the granddaughter. Regarding the driving record, Plaintiffs may raise this in rebuttal if Defendant puts the issue in through their expert or otherwise. Denying 128 Motion in Limine and finding as moot 130 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/28/2014. (jak)
May 19, 2014 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re General Order 54, Attorney Vicki Gilliam, staff member Melissa Legate, Attorney Frank Day, and all lawyers and staff affiliated with this case are authorized to bring cell phones, laptop computers, digital cameras, or personal digital assistants into the Courthouse on June 10, 2014, and thereafter, subject to the rules contained within this Order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/19/2014. (jak)
May 2, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 94 Motion in Limine, 95 Motion to Exclude; denying Defendants' 97 Motion to Exclude, 98 Motion for Summary Judgment, 99 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/2/2014. (jak)
March 10, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 88 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/10/2014. (jak)
September 10, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 77 Motion to Strike and the errata sheet attached to Mr. Smith's deposition transcript is stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/10/2013. (jak)
September 5, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER/ORDER to counsel Frank Day asking to advise if the understanding of the phrase "errata sheet" is correct by 4:00 p.m. Tuesday, September 10, 2013. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/5/2013. (jak)
September 3, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 Motion to Compel. If the lawyers are unable to resolve their disputes, Plaintiffs may file a new motion with the Court. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/3/2013. (jak)
May 15, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 73 Joint Motion for Continuance and Resetting of Trial Date and Scheduling Order. A new Scheduling Order, with a new trial date, will be sent shortly. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 05/15/2013. (jak)
April 24, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 68 Plaintiffs' Third Motion to Compel. Mr. Ogles has responded to 71 Letter/Order. Mr. Ogles is directed to provide Defendant's lawyer with a list of the documents he has requested and is unable to access. Defendant's lawyer must then provide paper copies of the those documents to Mr. Ogles within 10 days of receipt of the list. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 04/24/2013. (jak)
April 23, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER/ORDER directing counsel to advise whether or not an expert witness is hired to testify and, if so, is he or she capable of accessing the design files that are unavailable in paper form. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 04/23/2013. (jak) (Docket text modified on 4/23/2013 to correct the description of the document filed.) (thd).
April 10, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER pursuant to agreement of the parties involved in this case. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 04/10/2013. (jak)
April 4, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Defendant to submit a proposed protective Order within 10 days of this Order - if it feels that one is warranted. Once a protective Order has been entered, Defendant must produce the documents at issue to Plaintiffs re 50 MOTION to Compel and 64 Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 04/04/2013. (jak)
March 21, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 50 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Based on the parties agreement, Jacobs Engineering is ordered to provide me with all the employee and personal files of all employees who were involved in MOT on Job #110492 within ten days of this order. I will review these documents in camera and then determine whether Plaintiffs are entitled to view them -- and if so, whether a protective order is warranted. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 03/21/2013. (jak)
March 6, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER regarding telephone conference for 3/8/2013. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 03/06/2013. (jak)
November 21, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel as outlined by this Order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/21/2012. (jak)
November 7, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER/ORDER directing counsel to resolve certain issues. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/7/2012. (jak)
August 27, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Defendant's Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 08/27/2012. (jak)
June 5, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice Defendants Paul David Penn, Mark Asher & Robert Wilcox, Jr. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/5/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chandler et al v. Jacobs Engineering Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Chandler
Represented By: Johnson D. Ogles
Represented By: Vicki L. Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Chandler
Represented By: Johnson D. Ogles
Represented By: Vicki L. Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobs Engineering Group Inc
Represented By: Donald H. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul David Penn
Represented By: Donald H. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Asher
Represented By: Donald H. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wilcox, Jr
Represented By: Donald H. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APAC-Tennessee Inc
Represented By: Steven Snyder
Represented By: Lawrence Wilson White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?