Mitchell v. Postal Service (U.S.)

Plaintiff: Gerald W Mitchell
Defendant: Postal Service (U.S.)
Case Number: 3:2012cv00106
Filed: April 27, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 28 Plaintiff Mitchell's Motion to reconsider the Order of dismissal and to reopen the case is denied as moot. The case previously was dismissed without prejudice, is closed, and judgment has been entered. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/11/2012. (jak)
November 20, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER construing Mr. Mitchell's 28 Letter as a motion to reconsider the Court's order of dismissal and to reopen this case. The Court directs the defendant to respond to Mr. Mitchell's motion by December 7, 2012. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/20/2012. (jak)
November 9, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 26 Order dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/9/2012. (jak)
May 2, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff's attention to the fact that he is required to be familiar & comply with all the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, as well as the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to so comply can result in dismissal of Plaintiff's claim. The Clerk is directed to serve this Order on Plaintiff by both regular mail & certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/2/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Postal Service (U.S.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Postal Service (U.S.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald W Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?