Langford et al v. Wilkins et al

Plaintiff: Phyllis Langford and Gheric Bruce
Defendant: Jimmy Wilkins and Hughes School District No. 29
Case Number: 3:2012cv00111
Filed: May 4, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2015 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 164 Motion for Attorney Fees. To the extent that Mr. Hardage's motion for attorney's fees request that this Court order HSD to disburse the settlement funds, the Court grants Mr. Hardage's motion and directs HSD to disburse the settlement funds. The decision to award attorney's fees is discretionary, not mandatory. In light of these circumstances, the Court denies Mr. Hardage's motions for attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/24/2015. (jak)
April 21, 2015 166 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 165 Opinion and Order, the Court grants defendants' motions for summary judgment as to the claims of plaintiffs Phyllis Langford, Michael Manning, and Dovie Wolf (Dkt. Nos. 88 , 97 , 91 ). The Court dismisses with prejudice Ms. Langford, Mr. Manning, and Ms. Wolf's claims. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/21/2015. (jak)
April 7, 2015 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 144 Motion to Enforce settlement agreement to the extent that it applies to defendants' obligations to Ms. Guyer and Mr. Bruce. The Court finds that Mr. Hardage through his affidavit and representations through counsel , has substantially performed his obligation to show that his income is not subject to any medical lien. Therefore, the Court directs defendants to distribute the settlement funds to Mr. Hardage in the amount previously agreed upon at the October 28, 2014, hearing. The Court takes under advisement Mr. Hardage, Ms. Guyer, and Mr. Bruce's request for attorney's fees, costs, and expenses. Plaintiffs may submit further briefing on this request. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/7/2015. (jak)
December 23, 2014 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 144 Motion. The Court will conduct a telephone hearing on the motion sometime during the week of January 12, 2015. All counsel are directed to send an electronic mail message to the Court's Courtroom Deputy on or before Tuesday, January 6, 2015, advising the Court of their availability for a telephone hearing to be scheduled the week of January 12, 2015. The Court will set the hearing by separate Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/23/2014. (jak)
November 24, 2014 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER removing this case from the trial docket scheduled for December 1, 2014. If needed, the Court will set a new trial date by separate Order after ruling on the pending motions for summary judgment. The Court grants HSD's 139 Motion to file a motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/24/2014. (jak)
October 30, 2014 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing with prejudice the claims of Mr. Bruce, Ms. Guyer, and Mr. Hardage pursuant to settlement. The Court retains jurisdiction for 30 days to enforce the settlement terms. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/30/2014. (jak)
October 14, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 81 Motion to Dismiss. Ms. Cordell's claims and the counter-claims of Hughes School District No. 27 against Ms. Cordell are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/14/2014. (jak)
September 17, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/17/2014. (jak)
January 17, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 62 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/17/2014. (jak)
November 15, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER scheduling a telephone conference to address Defendants' 64 Second Motion to Compel Discovery on Monday, November 18, 2013, beginning at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/15/2013. (jak)
August 30, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion to Compel discovery as to Mr. Bruce, Ms. Langford, Ms. Wolf, and Mr. Manning. The Court orders Mr. Bruce, Ms. Langford, Ms. Wolf, and Mr. Manning to respond in full to defendants' outstanding written discovery reque sts on or before September 17, 2013. The Court denies defendants' motion to compel discovery as to Ms. Stacy Sharp, as Ms. Sharp is no longer a plaintiff in the case as of Courts 54 Order. The Court denies defendants request for attorneys' fees and costs associated with the filing of this motion. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/30/2013. (jak)
August 28, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Motion to non-suit claims. Ms. Sharp's Motion is granted and her claims against all defendants are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/28/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langford et al v. Wilkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Langford
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gheric Bruce
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hughes School District No. 29
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?