Dickinson et al v. SunTrust Mortgage Inc et al

Plaintiff: Robert Dickinson and Pamela Dickinson
Defendant: SunTrust Mortgage Inc and Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 3:2012cv00112
Filed: May 10, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 67 Motion for Attorney Fees and granting in part Motion for costs. Defendants are awarded costs in the amount of $945.39. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/9/2015. (jak)
April 23, 2015 66 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 65 Order, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. All pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/23/2015. (jak)
February 24, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion. This case will be tried beginning on either Monday, August 31, 2015, or Tuesday, September 8, 2015. Plaintiffs have until March 6 to either file notice that they will proceed on the first amen ded complaint or to file an amended complaint. Defendants have until March 20 to file a responsive pleading. The parties have until April 10 to conduct the Rule 26(f) conference and establish hard deadlines and to choose which trial date, August 31 or September 8, is more convenient. Finally, the parties have until April 24 to file their 26(f) report providing formal notice of the agreed upon deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/24/2015. (jak)
February 5, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 36 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/5/2014. (jak)
August 29, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Joint Motion to Lift Stay. The deadlines are amended as follows: Defendants have thirty days from entry of this Order to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's 7 Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's have thirty days af ter Defendants' response to respond to any motion to dismiss filed by Defendants. Defendants have fourteen days from the filing of Plaintiffs' response within which to file a reply in support of any motion to dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/29/2013. (jak)
February 11, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 16 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Defendants may re-file the motion when the case is no longer stayed. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/11/2013. (jak)
November 1, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion to Stay. This case is hereby stayed pending further order. The Dickinsons shall file a status report within seven days of the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals rendering a decision in any of the appeals cited in their motion to stay. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/1/2012. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickinson et al v. SunTrust Mortgage Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dickinson
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Represented By: John G. Emerson, Jr.
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Represented By: Christopher D. Jennings
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Represented By: Annabelle Lee Patterson
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Daniel Odell Turner
Represented By: Todd Martin Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Dickinson
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Represented By: John G. Emerson, Jr.
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Represented By: Christopher D. Jennings
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Represented By: Annabelle Lee Patterson
Represented By: Scott E. Poynter
Represented By: Daniel Odell Turner
Represented By: Todd Martin Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Mortgage Inc
Represented By: Mitchell Lloyd Berry
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Represented By: Johnathan D. Horton
Represented By: Diana Borgognoni Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Mitchell Lloyd Berry
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Represented By: Johnathan D. Horton
Represented By: Diana Borgognoni Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?