Davis v. LKQ Auto Parts of Memphis Inc et al

Plaintiff: Chad Davis
Defendant: LKQ Auto Parts of Memphis Inc and James Klenke, III
Case Number: 3:2012cv00115
Filed: May 15, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT; The parties having consummated their settlement in total re 20 Notice, the complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/14/2012. (jak)
November 15, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 13 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court awards Davis a reasonable attorney's fee of $3,000.00 and reasonable costs of $461.62. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/15/2012. (jak)
July 2, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 MOTION to Dismiss LKQ Auto Parts of Memphis, Inc. filed by Chad Davis. LKQ Auto Parts of Memphis Inc is dismissed without prejudice. The case will go forward against Klenke, Individually & d/b/a I-55 Auto Parts. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/2/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. LKQ Auto Parts of Memphis Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Davis
Represented By: Anne Michelle Milligan
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LKQ Auto Parts of Memphis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Klenke, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?