Brown v. Craighead County Detention Center

Plaintiff: D'Andre Detrez Brown
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2012cv00134
Filed: June 4, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 18 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 14 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, and pltf's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/4/13. (vjt)
January 24, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff Mr. Brown to notify the Court of his current address. His failure to respond to this Order will result in the dismissal of his claims. Further, Defendant's motion will be held in abeyance until Mr. Brown has notified the Court of his current address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/24/2013. (jak)
August 30, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that parties may file dispositive motions on or before 1/30/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/30/12. (vjt)
August 21, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety. Mr. Brown's claims against defendant Holiday in his official capacity are DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 08/21/2012. (jak)
June 6, 2012 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER advising Mr. Brown that he must either pay the $350 filing fee, or file an in forma pauperis application, within 30 days of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send Mr. Brown the application, along with a copy of this Order. Mr. Brown is ordered to file an amended complaint, as directed, w/i 30 days of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order could result in the dismissal of Plaintiff's claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/6/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Andre Detrez Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?