Heard v. Mississippi County Sheriff's Department et al

Plaintiff: Louise Heard
Defendant: James Sanders, John Does and Mississippi County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 3:2012cv00137
Filed: June 8, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 58 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is hereby dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/16/2014. (jak)
May 8, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion to Continue. 49 Motion for Enlargement of Time and 46 Motion to Compel are denied as moot. Defendant Sanders's responses will be deemed timely. The parties have an additional thirty days to engage in discovery and to supplement their summary judgment papers. Ms. Heard's request for sanctions is denied. The bench trial scheduled for May 9, 2014, is cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/8/2014. (jak)
April 10, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of time to respond to the pending Motion for Summary Judgment. Ms. Heard's response is now due on or before May 9, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/10/2014. (jak)
July 23, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing the unnamed John Doe defendants without prejudice, for lack of timely identification and service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/23/2013. (jak)
June 25, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Ms. Heard's claims against Defendant Sanders in his individual capacity are dismissed without prejudice. She may proceed, however, on her claims against Defendant Sanders in his official capacity. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/25/2013. (jak)
February 15, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff that the Court will dismiss claims against the John Doe defendants, without prejudice, unless they are identified by name and served with summons and Complaint, with proof of service provided to the Court by March 29, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/15/2013. (jak)
February 12, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion to Dismiss. All claims against the Mississippi County Sheriff's Department are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/12/13. (jak)
October 26, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment due to the requirements of Arkansas Rule 4(d)(8)(A)(ii) not being fully satisfied. Ms. Heard is given thirty days from the date of entry of this Order to properly serve the defendants. Failure to comply with this Order may result in Ms. Heard's claims being dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/26/2012. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heard v. Mississippi County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Heard
Represented By: Jimmie L. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?