Allegiance Health Management Inc v. Pocahontas Arkansas, City of

Plaintiff: Allegiance Health Management Inc
Defendant: Pocahontas Arkansas, City of
Case Number: 3:2012cv00139
Filed: June 11, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER determining that the bench trial in this case will begin at 9:15 a.m. on Monday, October 21, 2013 in Jonesboro Courtroom 324 re 18 Amended Final Scheduling Order. Counsel should be present by 8:30 a.m. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/1/2013. (jak) (Docket text modified on 10/2/2013 to correct a typographical error.)(thd).
September 30, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 37 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/30/2013. (jak)
September 20, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. Because this matter is scheduled for a bench trial, the Court will reserve further comment on this action until the evidence has been received and the Court makes findings of fact and conclusions of law. The Court encourages the attorneys to endeavor to stipulate to all of the undisputed facts and to limit testimony to the factual issues as to which there is a genuine dispute so that the trial can be streamlined. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/20/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allegiance Health Management Inc v. Pocahontas Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pocahontas Arkansas, City of
Represented By: Robert F. Thompson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allegiance Health Management Inc
Represented By: Robert David Freeze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?