Bryant et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Ladonya Bryant and Mark Bryant
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv00147
Filed: June 19, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Lawrence
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Joint Motion to Dismiss this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 05/13/2013. (jak)
April 11, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing all deadlines set forth in 7 Final Scheduling Order that have not already passed as of this date, including the deadline for filing motions in limine and for submitting jury instructions. An Amended Final Scheduling Order along with a new trial date will be issued should the settlement conference prove unsuccessful. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 04/11/2013. (jak)
April 9, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 16 Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, denying 13 State Farm's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and denying 42 Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 04/09/2013. (jak)
January 4, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to remove Exhibit 12 from the public docket re 16 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's are directed to file Exhibit 12 to document entry 16 under seal within ten days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/4/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladonya Bryant
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Represented By: Tony L. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Bryant
Represented By: Tony L. Wilcox
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: John E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?