Elliott v. Stevenson et al

Plaintiff: Bill Elliott
Defendant: Hamilton Stevenson, Double J Transport LLC and John Does
Case Number: 3:2012cv00152
Filed: June 22, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The court has been notified that a settlement has been reached in this matter. Therefore, the complaint and all claims in this action against defendant be, and they are, hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Court retains complete jurisdiction for 30 days to vacate this Order and to reopen the action if it is satisfactorily shown that settlement has not been completed and further litigation is necessary. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/24/2014. (jak)
October 1, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion for Continuance. This case is removed from the trial docket for the week of October 21, 2013. A new scheduling order will be entered separately. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/1/2013. (jak)
September 4, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 MOTION to Strike and for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/4/2013. (jak)
September 26, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion. Plaintiff is permitted to engage in discovery of Hamilton Stevenson related to the identity and location of Double J Transport, LLC. The deadline for submitting the Rule 26(f) report is extended up to and including December 4, 2012. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 09/26/2012. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. Stevenson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Stevenson
Represented By: Richard A. Lusby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Double J Transport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Elliott
Represented By: Dustin H. Jones
Represented By: Raney English Coleman
Represented By: Tony L. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?