Ferguson v. Proassurance Indemnity Company Inc et al

Plaintiff: Andrea West Ferguson
Defendant: St Bernard's Hospital Inc, Healthcare Medical Group Inc, Proassurance Indemnity Company Inc, Robert L Warner, Jr and Jonesboro Surgical Associates PA
Case Number: 3:2012cv00170
Filed: July 5, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Joint Motion for Dismissal. The parties state that a settlement was reached and this case is dismissed with prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement, and, if necessary, vacate this order and reopen this action for good cause shown. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 05/09/2013. (jak)
April 4, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Defendant's First Motion in Limine. Based on the parties' agreements, the first four requests are granted. However, Plaintiff may attempt to impeach Dr. Mabry's testimony by attacking his credibility or with evidence of bias to the extent permitted by the Federal Rules of Evidence. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 04/04/2013. (jak)
March 29, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss separate Defendant Surgical Associates of Jonesboro without prejudice. Additionally, because Surgical Associates of Jonesboro has been dismissed, its 40 Rule 10(c) Motion and 47 Motion in Limine are DISMISSED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 03/29/2013. (jak)
March 21, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER informing counsel that if it chooses not to respond by 5:00 p.m. Thursday March 28, 2013, to Defendant's 36 Motion in Limine it will be granted. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 03/21/2013. (jak)
January 10, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Party. Accordingly, Jonesboro Surgical Associates, P.A. is hereby dismissed from this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/10/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson v. Proassurance Indemnity Company Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Bernard's Hospital Inc
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Represented By: Paul D. Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Medical Group Inc
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Represented By: Paul D. Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proassurance Indemnity Company Inc
Represented By: Paul D. Waddell
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Warner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonesboro Surgical Associates PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea West Ferguson
Represented By: J. Lamar Porter
Represented By: Thomas T. Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?