Tippy v. NAES Corporation

Plaintiff: Perry Tippy
Defendant: NAES Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv00196
Filed: August 8, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice. The release set forth in paragraph 2 of the settlement agreement shall apply in the manner set forth in that paragraph. The Court retains complete jurisdiction for 30 days to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement, as necessary, and to vacate this Order and to reopen the action if it is satisfactorily shown that settlement has not been completed and further litigation is necessary. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/23/2014. (jak)
July 2, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER based on counsels' written representations to the Court, this case is removed from the trial docket for the week of July 7, 2014. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/2/2014. (jak)
December 11, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion for Limited Admission. Mr. Gallagher, in addition to Eva C. Madison, shall be counsel of record for defendant. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/11/2012. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tippy v. NAES Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Tippy
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAES Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?