Hart v. Childress

Plaintiff: Jerry Hart
Defendant: Amanda Childress
Case Number: 3:2012cv00203
Filed: August 24, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 25 Order of Dismissal, it is CONSIDERED, ORDERED, AND ADJUDGED that this case is DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/29/2013. (jak)
March 26, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file within thirty days of the entry of this Order, a Response to 15 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with the Fed. R. Civ. P. 56, Local Rule 56.1, an d the instructions set forth in this Order. Plaintiff is advised that failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in either all of the facts in Defendant's summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff or the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 03/26/2013. (jak)
October 9, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 5 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety as this court's findings in all respects. Mr. Hart may proceed with his inadequate medical care claim against defendant Childress in her individual capacity o nly. Mr. Hart's inadequate medical care claim against Childress in her official capacity is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Childress, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint, amended complaint, and this order on her without prepayment of fees and costs or security. The court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/9/2012. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart v. Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?