McDaniel v. Allen et al

Plaintiff: Calvin Ray McDaniel
Defendant: Mandy Childress, Theresa Bonner, Mike Allen and Ronnie Coleman
Case Number: 3:2012cv00213
Filed: September 14, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 35 Order entered this date, it is considered, ordered and adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/8/2013. (jak)
May 21, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a Response, within fifteen days of the entry of this Order, to 29 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that complies with FED. R. CIV. P. 56, Local Rule 56.1, and the instructions set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 05/21/2013. (jak)
February 19, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 20 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration for reasons set forth in the January 8, 2013 Order 19 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 02/19/2013. (jak)
October 22, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Defendant Mike Allen is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/22/2012. (jak)
October 1, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for defendants Ronnie Coleman, Teresa Bonner, and Mandy Childress. The U.S. Marshal is directed to service a copy of 4 Amended Complaint and summons on these Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/1/2012. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel v. Allen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandy Childress
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Bonner
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Coleman
Represented By: Colin P. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Ray McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?