White et al v. Robert Bosch Tool Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Kendall White, Tomeka Boyce, Lashundra Brooks, Tonja Prackett, Temeka Jordan and Dominique Bedford
Defendant: Keith James, Kalamus Washington, Robert Bosch LLC, Tammy Hale, Jim Sellars, Charles Chase and Robert Bosch Tool Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv00218
Filed: September 18, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 43 Order entered on this day, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/23/2014. (ks)
January 27, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice, denying 34 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Complaint, and denying 36 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/27/2014. (jak)
December 28, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The Title VII claims against Charles Chase are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/28/2012. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. Robert Bosch Tool Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalamus Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch LLC
Represented By: Paul D. Waddell
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Hale
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Represented By: Paul D. Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Sellars
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Represented By: Paul D. Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Chase
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Represented By: Paul D. Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch Tool Corporation
Represented By: Paul D. Waddell
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall White
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomeka Boyce
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashundra Brooks
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonja Prackett
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Temeka Jordan
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Bedford
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?