Fowler et al v. Coleman et al

Plaintiff: Paul Fowler, Willie Wells, Timothy Mosley and Shindid Braddock
Defendant: Shanice Mobley, Mandi Childress, Ronnie Coleman and Teresa Bonner
Case Number: 3:2012cv00228
Filed: October 1, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to submit an updated in forma pauperis motion within fifteen days of the date of this Order. Failure to respond to this Order may result in the dismissal without prejudice of Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/25/2013. (jak)
June 6, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 60 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety. Defendants' 55 Motion to Dismiss is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 06/06/2013. (jak)
April 25, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to respond to 55 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss within fifteen days of the date of this Order. Failure to respond may result in the dismissal without prejudice of this action, for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 04/25/2013. (jak)
March 18, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety 40 Partial Recommended Disposition. Plaintiffs Paul Fowler and Shindid Braddock and defendants Teresa Bonner, Shanice Mobley, and Mandi Childress are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/18/2013. (dmn)
February 20, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that service is appropriate for the Defendants Ronnie Coleman and Mike Allen. The Clerk of the Court shall prepare summons for the Defendants and the United States Marshal is hereby directed to serve a copy of 31 Amended and summons on Defendants Coleman and Allen without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 02/20/2013. (jak)
January 8, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff's Fowler, Braddock, and Wells to notify this Court of their current addresses and their intent to continue prosecution with this action pro se within thirty days of this Order. Failure to comply shall result in the dismissal without prejudice of Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/8/2013. (jak)
December 20, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating in part 11 Order. Plaintiff Wells was terminated from the case; however, Wells filed 12 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Therefore upon sua sponte reconsideration, it is held that Wells should be reinstated as a plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/20/2012. (jak)
November 19, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER construing 4 Response filed by Willie Wells as a request for an extension of time. Therefore, Wells shall have an additional fifteen days from the date of this Order in which to file an in forma pauperis Motion. Failure to file such shall result in his dismissal from the Complaint, for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/19/2012. (jak)
October 5, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing separate Plaintiff's Wells, Mosley, and Braddock to submit either the $350 statutory filing fee or In Forma Pauperis Motions within thirty days of the entry date of this Order. Failure to submit the filing fee or IFP Motio ns will result in their dismissal without prejudice from this case.The Clerk is directed to send to the Plaintiffs In Forma Pauperis Motions, together with the filing fee calculation sheets. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/5/2012. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fowler et al v. Coleman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanice Mobley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandi Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shindid Braddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?