McClanton v. Payment et al

Plaintiff: Rodney W McClanton
Defendant: Paul Payment, Nelson, Leonard Brown and Bearden
Case Number: 3:2012cv00252
Filed: November 5, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, consistent with the Order of Dismissal that was entered on this day, this case is DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE, pursuant to settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 06/25/2013. (kcs)
January 29, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents. The Clerk is directed to refrain from docketing any future written discovery from Plaintiff. Further, 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/29/2013. (jak)
November 29, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED PARTIAL DISPOSITION. Plaintiff's claims against defendants in their official capacities are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may proceed with his excessive force and failure to protect claims against defendants in their individual capacities only. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for defendants Payment, Nelson, Brown, and Bearden, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint, and this order on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Further, an informa pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/29/2012. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClanton v. Payment et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney W McClanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Payment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bearden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?