December 23, 2014 |
Filing
75
CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/23/2014. (jak)
|
July 9, 2014 |
Filing
68
ORDER of Recusal. The Clerk shall reassign these cases to another Judge drawn at random. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/9/2014. (jak)
|
July 7, 2014 |
Filing
65
ORDER granting Insurance Company of America's motion to withdraw the reference in case 4:14-mc-00007. The stay is lifted in this case and a status report on the party substitution is due by 31 July 2014. Consolidating these two cases is the best way to resolve the parties' dispute and promote the efficient use of the parties' and the Court's resources. Case 4:14-mc-00007 is consolidated with 3:12-cv-00254. The older case shall be the lead case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/7/2014. (jak)
|
May 19, 2014 |
Filing
63
ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign this case due to Judge Wright's senior status. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 5/19/2014. (jak)
|
September 30, 2013 |
Filing
60
ORDER granting 55 Motion to Stay and for an Extension of Time. This matter is stayed indefinitely. The Clerk is directed to administratively terminate this case. The trial set for October 7, 2013, is cancelled. Plaintiff is directed to file a status report or motion to lift stay no later than October 1, 2014. The Clerk is directed to serve this Order on Debbie Thomas by both regular and certified mail. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/30/2013. (jak)
|
September 6, 2013 |
Filing
52
ORDER GRANTING CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST with requirements listed within this Order to remain in full force and effect until the case is fully and finally concluded or until the Court otherwise orders. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/6/2013. (jak)
|
September 5, 2013 |
Filing
50
ORDER designating the trial of this matter to be conducted at the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse, 600 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, Arkansas, Courtroom A530. The Court will consider any timely objection the parties may have to m oving the trial from Jonesboro to Little Rock. Objections must be filed by 5:00 p.m. on September 16, 2013. The Clerk is directed to serve this Order on defendant, Debbie L. Thomas, by both regular and certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/5/2013. (jak)
|
August 16, 2013 |
Filing
44
ORDER directing Defendants to respond to 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Constructive Trust on or before August 27, 2013. Failure to do so will result in the granting of the Motion. The Clerk is directed to serve this Order on defendants by both regular and certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/16/2013. (jak)
|
August 9, 2013 |
Filing
41
ORDER regarding requirements and restrictions imposed on Defendants. This Order shall remain in full force and effect until the case is fully and finally concluded or until the Court otherwise orders. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/9/2013. (jak)
|
August 1, 2013 |
Filing
37
ORDER directing the Defendants to provide to Plaintiff on or before August 7, 2013, full and complete response to Plaintiff's interrogatories and requests for production of documents. The Clerk is directed to serve this Order on Defendants by both regular and certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 08/01/2013. (jak)
|
July 8, 2013 |
Filing
28
ORDER directing Defendants' attention to the fact that they are required to be familiar with and comply with all the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as well as the Local Rules of this Court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve this Order on defendants by both regular and certified mail, return receipt requested. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/8/2013. (jak)
|
June 6, 2013 |
Filing
22
ORDER directing that the Defendants have until June 28, 2013 to inform the Court of the name and address of their new attorney or whether they intent to proceed pro se. If defendants require any further extensions of time, they are to contact the Plaintiff and then the Court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve this Order on defendants by both regular mail and certified mail. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/6/2013. (jak)
|