Williams et al v. Coleman et al

Plaintiff: Angela Kaye Williams and Cassandra Henry
Defendant: Angie Bransetter, Mandi Childress and Ronald Coleman
Case Number: 3:2012cv00257
Filed: November 13, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Crittenden
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 29 Order dismissing this case without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 03/18/2013. (jak)
January 31, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff if she wishes to proceed with this lawsuit to submit a current request to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee of $350 to the Court within thirty days of entry of this Order. She is further directed to notify the Court of her new address. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/31/2013. (jak)
January 30, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety. Plaintiff's Angela Williams's claims against Defendant Angie Bransetter are dismissed without prejudice and Bransetter is dismissed from this action. Williams's claims against defendants Ronald Coleman and Mandi Childress, in their official capacities, are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/30/2013. (jak)
January 9, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare a summons for Defendants Coleman and Childress and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve these Defendants with copies of the complaint, amended complaint with attachments, and summonses. Service is not proper for Defendant Bransetter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/9/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Coleman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Bransetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandi Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Kaye Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?