Phillips Jr v. Coleman et al

Plaintiff: Edward Phillips Jr
Defendant: Ronnie Coleman, Theres Bonner and Payment
Case Number: 3:2012cv00273
Filed: November 28, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 25 Memorandum and Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, dismissed without prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/14/2014. (jak)
December 13, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an updated Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within fifteen days of this Order. The Clerk is hereby directed to forward an in forma pauperis application to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/13/2013. (jak)
December 10, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 22 Partial Report and Recommendations. It is therefore ordered that Defendant Payment's 18 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is granted, and Plaintiff's monetary claims against Payment in his official capacity are dismissed. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/10/2013. (jak)
October 22, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plantiff to file a response to 18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment within fifteen days of the entry of this Order and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that complies with FED. R. CIV. P. 56, Local Rule 56.1, and the instructions set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/22/2013. (jak)
January 29, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is therefore Ordered that Defendants Coleman and Bonner are dismissed from this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/29/2013. (jak)
January 8, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare and issue summons for Defendant Payment and the United States Marshal to serve a copy of 2 Complaint and summons on Defendant without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/8/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips Jr v. Coleman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Phillips Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theres Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?