Mhoon et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company

Plaintiff: John Henry Mhoon, John Willard Smith, Jr, Donna Marie Smith, John Wilburn Garrett and Jeanne Leree Garrett
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 3:2012mc00001
Filed: January 30, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal; granting 2 Defendant's MOTION to Withdraw Reference & the referral of this action to the bankruptcy court is hereby withdrawn; denying as moot 10 Defendant's MOTION to Stay. This action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/29/2012. (jct)
April 17, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay. This action is stayed pending a ruling on the related cases to be heard on 4/25/2012. Plaintiffs' responses to the motion to dismiss the first amended class action complaint & motion to sta y adversary proceeding will be due 10 days following the entry of a ruling. Plaintiffs' response to the motion to withdraw reference & memorandum in support & motion to withdraw the reference of the adversary proceeding will be due 4/20/2012. Defendant will be permitted to file an amended motion to dismiss w/i 21 days following the ruling. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/17/2012. (jct)
February 10, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 & 13 Motions for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Laya Rose Kaigh & Elizabeth A Frohlich are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel for the defendant in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/10/2012. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mhoon et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Henry Mhoon
Represented By: Brad L. Hendricks
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Represented By: Thomas E. Fowler, Jr.
Represented By: Lyndsey D. Dilks
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Represented By: J. Lamar Porter
Represented By: George R. Wise, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Willard Smith, Jr
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Represented By: Lyndsey D. Dilks
Represented By: Thomas E. Fowler, Jr.
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Represented By: Brad L. Hendricks
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Represented By: J. Lamar Porter
Represented By: George R. Wise, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Marie Smith
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Represented By: Lyndsey D. Dilks
Represented By: Thomas E. Fowler, Jr.
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Represented By: Brad L. Hendricks
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Represented By: J. Lamar Porter
Represented By: George R. Wise, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wilburn Garrett
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Represented By: Lyndsey D. Dilks
Represented By: Thomas E. Fowler, Jr.
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Represented By: Brad L. Hendricks
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Represented By: J. Lamar Porter
Represented By: George R. Wise, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Leree Garrett
Represented By: Kathy A. Cruz
Represented By: Lyndsey D. Dilks
Represented By: Thomas E. Fowler, Jr.
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Represented By: Brad L. Hendricks
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Represented By: J. Lamar Porter
Represented By: George R. Wise, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Charles T. Coleman
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Frohlich
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Represented By: Laya R. Kaigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?