Spear v. Burton

Plaintiff: Michael Patrick Spear, Sr
Defendant: Dennis Burton
Case Number: 3:2013cv00006
Filed: January 9, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Sharp
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 7 Order dismissing this case without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 03/29/2013. (jak)
February 21, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff a copy 2 Order, along with an in forma pauperis application, calculation sheet, and certificate. Plaintiff is directed to pay the full $350.00 filing fee, or to file a completed application for leav e to proceed in forma pauperis, as well as a calculation sheet, and certificate, within 30 days of this Order's entry date. Plaintiff must also provide a notice of his current address. Plaintiff's failure to comply will result in the dismissal of his complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 02/21/2013. (jak)
January 16, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to forward an in forma pauperis application, calculation sheet, and certificate to Plaintiff. Plaintiff is directed to submit the $350 filing fee or to complete and sign the in forma pauperis application. Failure to do so within 30 days of this Order's entry date will result in the dismissal of his complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/16/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spear v. Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Patrick Spear, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?