Clark v. Hustafer et al

Plaintiff: David M Clark
Defendant: Dan Langston, Tommy Hustafer and Sammie Johnston
Case Number: 3:2013cv00012
Filed: January 16, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 44 Order, this case is dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/19/2013. (jak)
May 15, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 36 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition. Plaintiff's 27 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied without prejudice. Defendants' 34 Motion to Strike is denied as moot. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 05/15/2013. (jak)
May 13, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff a (freeworld) Amended Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff must file within thirty days of the entry of this Order a statement indicating whether he wishes to continue this lawsuit and an Ame nded Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is reminded that if he fails to timely and properly do so, this case will be dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c) (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 05/13/2013. (jak)
April 15, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to redocket 27 Plaintiff's "Letter" as "Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment" and 28 "Letter" as "Plaintiff's Supporting Exhibit". Plaintiff must file on or befor e May 10, 2013, a Response to 30 Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Service on Felix. Plaintiff is advised that if he fails to timely and properly do so, Defendant Felix will be dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/15/2013. (jak)
February 12, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing service for Defendants Hustafer, Johnston, and Langston. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, Complaint, Amended Complaints, and this Order on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 2/12/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Hustafer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Hustafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sammie Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?