Gann v. Household Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Crystal Gann
Defendant: Household Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv00071
Filed: March 4, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court will turn to the merits of the pending cross motions for summary judgment. The undecided part of the 95 Motion is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/30/2014. (jak)
April 10, 2015 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court has received the attached letter by fax from Gann's lawyer, which the Court construes as a motion to expedite. The request is granted. Household Life should file a short response to the motion to reconsider, 109 , by 15 April 2015. As the Court has advised counsel before, do not write letters directly to the Court; please file papers on the docket. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/10/2015. (jak)
April 17, 2015 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 109 Motion for Reconsideration. No good reason to reconsider the merits decision is presented by Gann's post-judgment motion. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/17/2015. (jak)
October 25, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Household Life Insurance Company's motion is granted as to plaintiff Crystal Gann's outrage claim and denied as to her bad faith claim. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/25/2013. (jak)
January 3, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 17 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/3/2014. (jak)
September 2, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing counsel to file a joint status report by 19 September 2014 regarding their availability for trial on either 17 November 2014 or 23 March 2015 if the settlement conference does not bear fruit. An Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue thereafter. The Court will rule on the pending motions if the parties don't settle at the conference. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/2/2014. (jak)
September 3, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER cancelling the 17 September 2014 settlement conference. Household Life's motion to stay, 95 , is granted in part as modified, denied in part, and held in abeyance in part. The case doesn't need a stay. The 40 Scheduling Order is su spended and the trial is cancelled. An Amended Final Scheduling Order setting the case for trial in Jonesboro on 23 March 2015 will issue. Gann should respond on the Rule 60 issues about the vacated Order and Judgment by 19 September 2014. Household Life may reply by 30 September 2014. Thereafter, the Court will rule on those issues, and the merits of the cross motions for summary judgment if those motions remain open for decision. We'll have the new trial date if we need it. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/3/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gann v. Household Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Gann
Represented By: David A. Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Household Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Represented By: Bruce B. Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.