Stevenson et al v. Blytheville School District #5

Plaintiff: Missy Langston, Jeff Langston, Stephanie Hale, George A Hale, III, Tracy Coppedge, Melissa Braswell, Oliver Coppedge, Ryan Braswell, Lori Adkisson, Heath Adkisson, Sharyn Stevenson and James E Stevenson, III
Defendant: Blytheville School District #5
Case Number: 3:2013cv00127
Filed: May 20, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 83 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant are dismissed with prejudice, and the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/2/2014. (jak)
October 10, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to term plaintiffs' 40 Motion for Issuance. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/10/2014. (jak)
July 1, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 07-01-13. (jlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevenson et al v. Blytheville School District #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blytheville School District #5
Represented By: George Jay Bequette, Jr.
Represented By: Robert L. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missy Langston
Represented By: Marie Bernarde Miller
Represented By: Robert Alexander Gaines
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Langston
Represented By: Marie Bernarde Miller
Represented By: Robert Alexander Gaines
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Hale
Represented By: Marie Bernarde Miller
Represented By: Robert Alexander Gaines
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George A Hale, III
Represented By: Marie Bernarde Miller
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Robert Alexander Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Coppedge
Represented By: Marie Bernarde Miller
Represented By: Robert Alexander Gaines
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Braswell
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Robert Alexander Gaines
Represented By: Marie Bernarde Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver Coppedge
Represented By: Marie Bernarde Miller
Represented By: Robert Alexander Gaines
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Braswell
Represented By: Robert Alexander Gaines
Represented By: Marie Bernarde Miller
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Adkisson
Represented By: Marie Bernarde Miller
Represented By: Robert Alexander Gaines
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heath Adkisson
Represented By: Robert Alexander Gaines
Represented By: Marie Bernarde Miller
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharyn Stevenson
Represented By: Marie Bernarde Miller
Represented By: Robert Alexander Gaines
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Stevenson, III
Represented By: Marie Bernarde Miller
Represented By: Robert Alexander Gaines
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?