Henry v. Hall et al

Plaintiff: Archie W Henry
Defendant: Marty Boyd, Brent Duncan and Matt Hall
Consol_defendant: Tracy Reece and Chasity Jackson
Case Number: 3:2013cv00146
Filed: May 21, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Craighead
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 107 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/2/2014. (jak)
March 12, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to issue summons, and the U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of the summons and 14 Amended Complaint on Defendant Troxel, at the addresses provided under seal, without prepayment of fees and costs and security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 3/12/2014. (jak)
January 28, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for Defendants Tracy Reece and Chasity Jackson. The U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of the Summons and 14 Amended Complaint at the address provided under seal, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/28/2014. (jak)
October 21, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 16 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. It is therefore ordered that Defendants Marty Boyd and Brent Duncan are dismissed from this action for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/21/2013. (jak)
June 12, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit and calculation sheet. Plaintiff shall submit within thirty days either the $400 statutory filing fee or a properly completed Application. The Clerk shall send a copy of this Order to the Craighead Detention Facility. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/12/2013. (jak)
May 31, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to transfer Plaintiff's entire case files to the Eastern District of Arkansas, Jonesboro Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/31/2013. (srw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Tracy Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Chasity Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archie W Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?