Ron Kingston Contracting Inc v. Cahaba Disaster Recovery LLC

Plaintiff: Ron Kingston Contracting Inc
Defendant: Cahaba Disaster Recovery LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00154
Filed: June 14, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: By agreement of the parties, this matter is hereby stayed while the parties engage in arbitration, pursuant to and consistent with this Court's previous orders dated September 3, 2013, and March 23, 2015. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/23/2015. (jak)
March 23, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 12 Motion. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/23/2015. (jak)
September 3, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion to Compel. This case is hereby stayed pending the outcome of arbitration. The Clerk is directed to administratively terminate this case. The parties may move the Court to reopen the case within thirty days from the date the arbitration is concluded. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/3/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ron Kingston Contracting Inc v. Cahaba Disaster Recovery LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Kingston Contracting Inc
Represented By: Robert F. Thompson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cahaba Disaster Recovery LLC
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Robert Alexander Gaines
Represented By: Bonnie Joan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?