Dudley Flying Service Inc v. Ag Air Maintenance Services Inc

Plaintiff: Dudley Flying Service Inc
Defendant: Ag Air Maintenance Services Inc
Case Number: 3:2013cv00156
Filed: June 18, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for good cause shown, Dudley Flying Service Inc's cause of action against defendant Ag Air Maintenance Services Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/21/2015. (jak)
April 17, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part and taking under advisement 50 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/17/2015. (jak)
April 15, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 56 Motion for Reconsideration and ruling that Dr. Kumar's anticipated testimony is admissible. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/15/2015. (jak)
April 8, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 36 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/8/2015. (jak)
March 30, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and takes under advisement in part the pending motion, 27 . The Court intends to hear argument from counsel on the pending matters at the pretrial hearing to be conducted in this matter and will reserve ruling on these matters until that time. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/30/2015. (jak)
July 12, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Limited Admission by Jon C. Kettles. Mr. Kettles, along with Jeffery Owen Scriber, shall be counsel of record for Plaintiff Dudley Flying Service, Inc. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/12/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dudley Flying Service Inc v. Ag Air Maintenance Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dudley Flying Service Inc
Represented By: Jon Kettles
Represented By: Jeffrey Owen Scriber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ag Air Maintenance Services Inc
Represented By: Donald H. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?