Capson Physicians Insurance Company v. MMIC Insurance Inc

Plaintiff: Capson Physicians Insurance Company
Defendant: MMIC Insurance Inc
Case Number: 3:2013cv00157
Filed: June 20, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2015 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 214 Motion for Bond. Supersedeas amount approved. Bond due by 31 August 2015. Enforcement of that part of the Judgment, 199 , awarding costs is stayed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/10/2015. (jak)
June 1, 2015 199 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Capson Physician Insurance Company's amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice. All Dr. Karl J. Hasik's counterclaims against MMIC Insurance Inc. are dismissed with prejudice, except for Dr. Hasik's proposed claim for bad faith, which the Court rejected at the proposed-amendment stage without prejudice for failure to state a claim. The Court confirms, as it ruled from the bench, that Iowa law governs Dr. Hasik's counterclaims. Crawford County Memorial Hospital&# 039;s third-party complaint against MMIC is dismissed with prejudice. MMIC Insurance Inc. shall have a declaratory judgment against Capson Physicians Insurance Company, Dr. Karl J. Hasik, Lillian Wilson, Samantha Ray, Dereck Ray, and Doe. The Court d eclares that MMIC has no obligation to defendant Dr. Hasik in the Wilson lawsuit or in the Ray lawsuit, or to pay any judgment entered against him in either case. MMIC is also entitled to rescind the prior-acts coverage provided by the endorsement ad ding Dr. Hasik to Policy No. IHP000103 upon making a full refund to Crawford County Memorial Hospital of the premium the hospital paid for the prior-acts coverage. MMIC may have its costs, as allowed by law, if it files a verified bill of costs by 15 June 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/1/2015. (jak)
May 19, 2015 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Scheduling Order, 49 , is suspended and the 15 June 2015 trial is cancelled. All pending motions in limine, 161 , 163 , 164 , & 166 are denied as moot. The dispute regarding the Ray testimony, 181 , is moot. The Court will issue another Order soon confirming its rulings on dispositive motions. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/19/2015. (jak)
May 14, 2015 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to General Order 54, the Court authorizes Beverly Rowlett, William Miller, Megan Flynn, Brent Cooper, Robert Witmeyer, Paulette Sarp, Christopher Dougherty, Steven Quattlebaum, and Teresa Roberts to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse in Little Rock on 19 May 2015 for the pretrial hearing in this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/14/2015. (jak)
May 13, 2015 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court is making its way through the summary judgment papers. Oral argument would be helpful. We'll start there at the May 19 hearing. Fifteen minutes per party. The Court modifies its Order, 156 : though everyone is welcome, only one lawyer per party needs to attend the hearing. The Court requests an updated notice from each party that covers all its filings. Given the many papers already received, trial briefs are optional, not required. Nothing already argued needs to be repeated. No responding trial briefs are needed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/13/2015. (jak)
April 28, 2015 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint report, 155 , noted and appreciated. The Court will proceed on the motions. This case is first out for trial on 15 June 2015. The Court has five days available for trial and no more. Counsel should tailor their proof accordingly. The Court will hold a pretrial in Courtroom 1A of the Richard Sheppard Arnold Courthouse in Little Rock, Arkansas on 19 May 2015 at 9:00 a.m. All counsel who will try the case must attend in person. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/28/2015. (jak)
March 23, 2015 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint discovery report, 107 , addressed. Motion to strike, 101 , denied with a caveat. Joint status report, 108 , noted and requested attendance Order at private mediation issued. Joint report on mediation due by 24 April 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/23/2015. (jak)
February 18, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Capson's motion to amend complaint, 56 granted. Amended complaint due by 25 February 2015. Dr. Hasik's motion to amend answer, 55 , granted on the counterclaims for breach of contract and declaratory judgment, denied on bad faith. Amended answer with counterclaims due by 25 February 2015. Crawford County Memorial Hospital's motion to intervene, 57 , granted as modified. Intervention is limited to the fee issue. Hospital's complaint due by 25 February 2015. Rays' motion to stay, 72 , denied. Joint report, 88 , noted and responded to. Dr. Hasik's motion to clarify, 89 , denied without prejudice to a joint report. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/18/2015. (jak)
January 20, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 78 Motion to Extend deadlines. Discovery is extended until 27 March 2015 and dispositive motion deadline is extended until 6 April 2015. The Hasiks' depositions will proceed pursuant to the Court's prior Order 76 . The Cou rt orders counsel for all parties to confer by conference call about the scheduling issues before 30 January 2015 and file a joint status report by 6 February 2015. Counsel are directed to address the issue of a settlement conference in the February report as well. The Court directs MMIC to file an addendum to its responding papers. Two page addendum due by 27 January 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/20/2015. (jak)
August 29, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 53 Motion to Quash. Follow the Court's Scheduling Order, 49 , on non-emergency discovery disputes. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/29/2014. (jak)
August 12, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to assign this action to another Judge. Judge J. Leon Holmes recused. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/12/2013. (jak)
June 24, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 and 3 Motions for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of R. Brent Cooper and Robin Donsky. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 06/24/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capson Physicians Insurance Company v. MMIC Insurance Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capson Physicians Insurance Company
Represented By: R. Brent Cooper
Represented By: Robin Donsky
Represented By: Scott D. Provencher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMIC Insurance Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?