Pullen v. Johnson et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Pullen, Jr
Defendant: Blaine Cagle, Sammie Johnson and John Cawley
Case Number: 3:2013cv00162
Filed: July 2, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Jonesboro Office
County: Greene
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file within 30 days a Response to 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John Cawley, Blaine Cagle, Sammie Johnson and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts as set forth in this Order. Plaintiff is advised tha t the failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in all facts in the Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff or the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/07/2014. (kcs)
November 1, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff a freeworld Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff must file the Application within thirty days of the entry of this Order. Plaintiff is reminded that if he fails to timely and properly do so, this case will be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/01/2013. (jak)
September 25, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 Partial Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's due process claim is dismissed, without prejudice, for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff may proceed with his inadequate medical care claim aga inst Defendants Johnson, Cagle, and Cawley. The Clerk is directed to prepare summons for Defendants Johnson, Cagle, and Cawley. The U.S. Marshal is directed to service the summons, complaint, amended complaint, and this Order on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. The Court CERTIFIES, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/25/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pullen v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaine Cagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sammie Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Pullen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?